Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emmanuel Daddi

Deceased

Archbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1894Born
3 Aug 191924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Jun 196065.5SelectedBishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Oct 196065.9ConfirmedBishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
19 Mar 196166.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
14 Feb 196772.2AppointedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Jan 198085.1DiedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Daddi
Archbishop Emmanuel Daddi (born , died ) Archbishop of Mossul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean)
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Church, Baghdad

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,384
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 576
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast