Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Youhanna Boutros Moshe

Archbishop Emeritus of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1943 Born
9 Jun 196824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
26 Jun 201066.5SelectedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
1 Mar 201167.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
16 Apr 201167.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
Sep 2021³77.7RetiredArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youhanna Boutros Moshe
Archbishop Youhanna Boutros Moshe (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mossul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQaraqosh
Ordained BishopMost Pure Virgin Mary, Church, Qaraqosh

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Mossul (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,038
  • sele: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 483
  • r: CB, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast