Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Joseph VI Audu

Deceased

Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1790¹BornAlkosch
1818¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 182535.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
1833²43.0AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
26 Dec 184758.0SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Sep 184858.7ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
14 Mar 187888.2DiedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph VI Audu:
Patriarch Joseph VI Audu (died ) Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia}

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 53.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,324
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014