Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Elie Mellus, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1831Born
21 Sep 185625.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 186432.7AppointedBishop of Aqrā {Akra} (Chaldean), Iraq
5 Jun 186432.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aqrā {Akra} (Chaldean), Iraq
4 Sep 189058.9AppointedBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey
16 Feb 190876.4DiedBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Jean-Elie Mellus (VIAF: 36042699)
Bishop Jean-Elie Mellus O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Mardin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMardin, Eparchy of Mardin (Chaldean)

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,340
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 367
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017