Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elie-Joseph Khayatt

Deceased

Archbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1856Born
1882²25.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 189438.4AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Nov 189438.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
9 Feb 189538.7ResignedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
22 Apr 189538.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis dei Caldei
13 Jul 190044.1AppointedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
2 Feb 190346.7DiedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Elie-Joseph Khayatt
Bishop Elie-Joseph Khayatt (born , died ) Archbishop of Kerkūk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagdad
Ordained BishopMossoul

  • a priest for 21.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,354
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 92, and Page 328
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 416
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,894, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast