Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarchate of Baghdad (Chaldean)

Patriarchatus Bagdathensis Chaldaeorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Louis RaphaŽl I Sako, Cardinal, Patriarch
  • Basel Salim Yaldo, Curial Bishop
  • Mikha Pola Maqdassi, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Shlemon Warduni, Curial Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Patriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)
20 April 1553RestoredPatriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)
17 January 1954Territory LostPatriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean) (Bassorah, Amarah, Kut, and Montefiq) Archeparchy of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean) (erected)
24 October 1960Territory LostPatriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean) (Chaikhan or Ain-Sefne, Alcosh, and Parts of Telkief and Mezure) Diocese of Alquoch (Chaldean) (erected)
24 October 1960Territory LostPatriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean) (Mosul, TePafr, Sinjar, and Al-Hadr) Eparchy of Mossul (Chaldean) (erected)
Patriarchate of Baghdad (Chaldean)
19 February 2022Name ChangedPatriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean) Patriarchate of Baghdad (Chaldean)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Patriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)
194985,0003,049,6972.8%527591,440503921ap1951
1970150,0003,500,0004.3%217285,357189722ap1971
Patriarchate of Baghdad (Chaldean)

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 9 Oct 2023