Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Yousef VII Ghanima

Deceased

Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1881BornMossul
15 May 190423.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 192544.1SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
10 May 192544.3Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
28 May 192544.3ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
28 May 192544.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Colybrassus
29 Apr 194665.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Martyropolis
17 Sep 194766.6SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
21 Jun 194867.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
8 Jul 195877.4DiedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Yousef VII Ghanima:
Patriarch Yousef VII Ghanima (born , died ) Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia}

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,365
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1925, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014