Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop RaphaŽl Rabban

Deceased

Archbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1910Born
23 Dec 193323.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 194737.0AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
4 May 194737.2Ordained BishopBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
28 Jun 195747.3AppointedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Nov 196757.7DiedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for RaphaŽl Rabban
Archbishop RaphaŽl Rabban (born , died ) Archbishop of Kerkūk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,373
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast