Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Nissan

Deceased

Bishop of Zaku (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1880BornDehük
18 Mar 190524.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 191433.8SelectedArchbishop of Sehna (Chaldean), Iran
15 Sep 191434.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Sehna (Chaldean), Iran
6 Dec 191535.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sehna (Chaldean), Iran
20 Apr 193756.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
30 Oct 195676.3DiedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Jean Nissan:
Archbishop Jean Nissan (born , died ) Bishop of Zaku

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,364
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014