Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grégoire Pierre Habra

Deceased

Archbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1856Born
16 Aug 190144.7AppointedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
26 Jan 190245.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
22 Oct 192366.8AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
21 Mar 193376.2DiedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Grégoire Pierre Habra
Archbishop Grégoire Pierre Habra (born , died ) Archbishop of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017