Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Israel Audo

Deceased

Bishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1859Born
2 May 188626.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 190949.7AppointedBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey
27 Feb 191050.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey
19 Mar 191050.6InstalledBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey
16 Feb 194181.5DiedBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Israel Audo
Bishop Israel Audo (born , died ) Bishop of Mardin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlqosh

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,361
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,910, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast