Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Yousef VI Emmanuel II Thomas

Deceased

Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1852Born
10 Jul 187926.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 189038.0SelectedBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey
3 Dec 189038.3ConfirmedBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey
24 Jul 189239.9Ordained BishopBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey
9 Jul 190047.9SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
17 Dec 190048.3ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
21 Jul 194794.9DiedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Yousef VI Emmanuel II Thomas
Patriarch Yousef VI Emmanuel II Thomas (born , died ) Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlqoa
Ordained BishopMossoul

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 54.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,351
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 137, and Page 514
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 76
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018