Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Eugène Manna

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq

Titular Bishop of Tabbora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1867¹Born
15 Aug 188922.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 190235.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabbora
30 Nov 190235.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabbora
1921²54.0AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Feb 192861.1DiedPatriarchal Vicar of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Eugène Manna (VIAF: 40593603)
Bishop Jacques-Eugène Manna (born 1867, died ) Patriarchal Vicar of Bassorah {Basra}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBakofa
Ordained BishopMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean)
Death PlaceMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean)

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,358
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 533
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 70
  • mn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast