Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Batta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1906BornMardin
14 Oct 193428.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 196559.6SelectedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
3 Jan 196659.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
25 Mar 196660.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
7 Mar 197770.9ResignedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
17 Dec 199488.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Batta:
Archbishop Gabriel Batta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Diarbekir (Amida)

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,388
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015