Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch RaphaŽl I Bidawid

Deceased

Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1922BornMossul
22 Oct 194422.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 195735.1AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
6 Oct 195735.4Ordained BishopBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
2 Mar 196643.8AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Chaldean), Lebanon
21 May 198967.0SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
21 May 198967.0SelectedArchbishop of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Jun 198967.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
7 Jul 200381.2DiedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for RaphaŽl I Bidawid:
Patriarch RaphaŽl I Bidawid (born , died ) Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia}

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,381
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015