Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yacoub Denha Scher

Deceased

Archbishop of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1934Born
10 Jun 196026.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 200166.7AppointedArchbishop of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean), Iraq
16 Feb 200166.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean), Iraq
8 Jan 200570.7DiedArchbishop of Arbil {Erbil} (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Yacoub Denha Scher
Archbishop Yacoub Denha Scher (born , died ) Archbishop of Arbil {Erbil}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShaklawa

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,908
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast