Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abdul-Ahad Sana

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alquoch (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1922BornAraden
15 May 194724.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 196038.0SelectedBishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Feb 196138.2ConfirmedBishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq
19 Mar 196138.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq
6 Dec 200179.0RetiredBishop of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq
28 Feb 200784.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Alquoch (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Abdul-Ahad Sana:
Bishop Abdul-Ahad Sana (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alquoch

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,385
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 1 Dec 2014