Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hanna Kello

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amadiyah (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1922BornManguèche
15 May 194725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
10 Oct 197351.5AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
16 Dec 197351.7Ordained BishopBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
6 Dec 200179.7RetiredBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
7 Sep 200280.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Hanna Kello:
Bishop Hanna Kello (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amadiyah

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,395
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2003, Page 1,068
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013