Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kevin William Barden, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ispahan, Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1908Born
28 Feb 193122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
30 May 197465.9AppointedArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran
25 Oct 197466.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran
12 Aug 198274.1RetiredArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran
4 Dec 200496.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Kevin William Barden
Archbishop Kevin William Barden O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ispahan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 73.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast