Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ephrem Bédé

Deceased

Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1916Born
15 May 194124.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 198063.8AppointedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt
15 Aug 198064.1Ordained BishopBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt
18 Jan 198467.5DiedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Ephrem Bédé
Bishop Ephrem Bédé (born , died ) Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlquoch dei Caldei
Ordained BishopBagdad

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,400
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,810
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast