Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youssef Ibrahim Sarraf

Deceased

Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1940BornLe Caire
19 Dec 196424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt
6 Feb 198443.3AppointedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt
13 May 198443.6Ordained BishopBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt
31 Dec 200969.2DiedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Youssef Ibrahim Sarraf:
Bishop Youssef Ibrahim Sarraf (born , died ) Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo}

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,406
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013