Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bausardo, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

Titular Bishop of Ida in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1951 BornLe Caire
2 Jul 197827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Feb 200149.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)
24 Feb 200149.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ida in Mauretania
3 Jun 200150.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ida in Mauretania
29 Oct 200857.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bausardo:
Bishop Giuseppe Bausardo S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013