Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Kassarji

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1956 BornZahlť
6 May 198528.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 200144.6AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Chaldean), Lebanon
10 Mar 200144.8Ordained BishopBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Chaldean), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Michel Kassarji:
Bishop Michel Kassarji (born ) Bishop of Beirut {Bairut}

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Beirut {Bairut} (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,929
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013