Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Scandar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1927Born
13 Jun 196538.0Ordained PriestPriest of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon
4 Aug 197750.2AppointedBishop of Baalbek e Zahlé (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Nov 197750.5Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek e Zahlé (Maronite), Lebanon
9 Jun 199063.0AppointedBishop of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Sep 200275.3RetiredBishop of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon
15 May 201891.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Georges Scandar
Bishop Georges Scandar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zahleh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZahleh
Death Place

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: CB, 16 May 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast