Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Georges Rizqallah Beseb’ely

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹BornBeseb’ely
1656¹61.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Jul 165661.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
1 Jan 165762.0SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
26 May 165964.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Apr 167075.3DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges Rizqallah Beseb’ely:
Patriarch Georges Rizqallah Beseb’ely (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 87
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,946

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014