Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Estephan Douaihi

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1630Born
25 Mar 165625.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 166837.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Nicosia
20 May 167039.7SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
8 Aug 167242.0ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
3 May 170473.7DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Estephan Douaihi
Patriarch Estephan Douaihi (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEhden

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,972
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018