Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Siméon VII Awad

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1683²BornHasroun, Lebanon
10 Jun 170825.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 171633.1Ordained BishopBishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
16 Mar 174360.2AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
11 Oct 174360.8InstalledPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Feb 175673.1DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Siméon VII Awad:
Patriarch Siméon VII Awad (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013