Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Elias Pierre Hoyek (Hoayek)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1843BornHelta
1870¹26.1Ordained PriestPriest
188945.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
14 Dec 188946.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Arca in Armenia
6 Jan 189955.1SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
19 Jun 189955.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
24 Dec 193188.1DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Elias Pierre Hoyek (Hoayek):
Patriarch Elias Pierre Hoyek (Hoayek) (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 108
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013