Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignace Mobarak

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon

Titular Archbishop of Gabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1876Born
29 Jun 190124.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 191942.4AppointedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
2 Mar 191942.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
20 Jan 195275.3RetiredArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
20 Jan 195275.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabala
19 May 195881.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace Mobarak
Archbishop Ignace Mobarak (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Beirut {Bairut}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRismayya

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast