Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Phares

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1871BornSurat, Lebanon
1897²25.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 192856.8SelectedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
8 Jul 192857.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
24 Jul 192857.0ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
15 Dec 194372.4DiedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Phares:
Bishop Emmanuel Phares (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013