Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Joseph El-Khazen, O.A.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1858³Born
23 Feb 191960.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
3 Aug 191961.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
22 Feb 193374.5DiedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Joseph El-Khazen
Bishop Louis Joseph El-Khazen O.A.M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSahel Alma, Lebanon

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast