Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Elie El-Hage

Deceased

Archbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1885Born
21 May 191025.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 192843.2SelectedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
29 Apr 192843.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
9 Jun 192843.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
30 Nov 195570.8DiedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria

MicroData Summary for Jean Elie El-Hage
Archbishop Jean Elie El-Hage (born , died ) Archbishop of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGedaidat-Gazir

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018