Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Bostani

Deceased

Bishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1876Born
20 Apr 189922.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 191942.2AppointedBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
2 Mar 191942.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
30 Oct 195780.9DiedBishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Augustin Bostani
Bishop Augustin Bostani (born , died ) Bishop of Saïdā (Sidone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDair-al-Qamar

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast