Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Chucrallah Khoury, C.M.L. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon

Note/Previous Titular See: (Cong. Missionariorum Libanensium)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1865Born
8 Dec 188621.8Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 190640.9AppointedArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
14 Apr 190641.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
11 Feb 193468.9DiedArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Chucrallah Khoury
Archbishop Chucrallah Khoury C.M.L. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBékacine

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 28
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018