Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antoine Pierre Cardinal Khoraiche

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1907BornAin Ebel
12 Apr 193022.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 195042.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saïda (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Apr 195042.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
15 Oct 195043.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
25 Nov 195750.2AppointedBishop of Saïda (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
3 Feb 197567.4SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
15 Feb 197567.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
2 Feb 198375.4Elevated to Cardinal
3 Apr 198678.5RetiredPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
19 Aug 199486.9DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Antoine Pierre Khoraiche:
Cardinal Antoine Pierre Khoraiche (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
  • a cardinal for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013