Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João (Jean) Chedid, O.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo

Priest of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1914BornKherbet-Kanafar, Lebanon
20 Dec 194127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)
21 Apr 195642.1SelectedPatriarchal Vicar
4 May 195642.2ConfirmedPatriarchal Vicar
4 May 195642.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
29 Jun 195642.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
1 Mar 196854.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
29 Nov 197157.7AppointedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Feb 198874.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Jun 199076.3RetiredBishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo, Brazil
31 Jul 199177.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João (Jean) Chedid:
Archbishop João (Jean) Chedid O.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015