Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John George Chedid

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1923BornEddé, Lebanon
21 Dec 195128.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 197148.4IncardinatedPriest of Saint Maron of Detroit (Maronite), Michigan, USA
27 Jun 197753.9IncardinatedPriest of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
13 Oct 198057.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
13 Oct 198057.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum dei Maroniti
25 Jan 198157.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum dei Maroniti
19 Feb 199470.6AppointedBishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA
20 Nov 200077.3RetiredBishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA
21 Mar 201288.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA

MicroData Summary for John George Chedid:
Bishop John George Chedid (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: CB, 23 Mar 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 20 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015