Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite)

Eparchia Sancti Maronis Bruklyniensis Maronitarum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Eparchy
  • Name Changed: 27 June 1977
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Maronite Catholic Church of the Antiochian Tradition
  • State: New York
  • Country: United States of America
  • Conference Region: XV (Eastern Rites)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.stmaron.org/
  • Mailing Address: Maronite Chancery Office, 109 Remsen St., Brooklyn, NY 11201
  • Telephone: (718)237-9913
  • Fax: 243-0444

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Maronite)
10 January 1966ErectedApostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Maronite) (erected)
Eparchy of Saint Maron of Detroit (Maronite)
29 November 1971ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Maronite) Eparchy of Saint Maron of Detroit (Maronite)
Eparchy of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite)
27 June 1977Name ChangedEparchy of Saint Maron of Detroit (Maronite) Eparchy of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Maronite)
1966125,000532552,272545ap1967
Eparchy of Saint Maron of Detroit (Maronite)
1976152,00066662,303544ap1977
Eparchy of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite)
198030,8006226448138848ap1981
199052,39979786609107554ap1991
199930,0006210724161213634ap2000
200030,0004310535661216534ap2001
200130,0004710575261214233ap2002
200230,0004510555451214233ap2003
200330,0005312654611419234ap2004
200430,0005011614911319234ap2005
200933,0005011615401415134ap2010
201033,0005011615401716134ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013