Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Hector Youssef Doueihi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1927BornZghortha, Lebanon
14 Aug 195528.1Ordained PriestPriest of Batrun (Maronite), Lebanon
1972²44.5IncardinatedPriest of Saint Maron of Detroit (Maronite), Michigan, USA
11 Nov 199669.3AppointedBishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
11 Jan 199769.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
10 Jan 200476.5RetiredBishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
17 Dec 201487.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Hector Youssef Doueihi:
Bishop Stephen Hector Youssef Doueihi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Brooklyn

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,886
  • d: CB, 17 Dec 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • inca: CB, 20 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015