Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elias Shaheen (Chahine)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1914BornEbrine
25 Mar 193924.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 198268.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
7 Nov 198268.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
13 Mar 198570.6AppointedArchbishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
23 Nov 199076.3RetiredArchbishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
5 Dec 199177.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada

MicroData Summary for Elias Shaheen (Chahine):
Archbishop Elias Shaheen (Chahine) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013