Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ramzi Garmou, Ist. del Prado

Archbishop Emeritus of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey

Administrator of Ahwaz (Chaldean)

Note(s): (Apostolic Visitor for Caldeans Residing in Europe)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1945 Born
13 Jan 197731.9Ordained PriestPriest of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran
5 May 199550.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran
25 Feb 199651.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran
7 Feb 199954.0SucceededArchbishop of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran
2001²55.9AppointedAdministrator of Ahwaz (Chaldean), Iran
20 Jul 201368.4AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
19 Nov 201671.7ResignedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
22 Dec 201873.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
22 Dec 201873.8AppointedPatriarchal Administrator of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran
Aug 2021³76.4CeasedPatriarchal Administrator of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran
2022¹76.9RetiredArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramzi Garmou
(WikiData: Q2130449)
Archbishop Ramzi Garmou Ist. del Prado (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Diarbekir (Amida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZākhō
Ordained BishopSt-Joseph, Cathedral, Téhéran, Archdiocese of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,688
  • s: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2018
  • r: CB, 11 Jun 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 10 Jan 2024