Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin Kmetec, O.F.M. Conv.

Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1956 Born
25 Sep 197720.8Simple VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Oct 198225.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
23 Feb 198326.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
29 Jun 198326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Dec 202064.0AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
2 Feb 202164.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Martin Kmetec
Archbishop Martin Kmetec O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Archbishop of Izmir (Smirne)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePtuj, Diocese of Lavant, Slovenia
Ordained DeaconRensselaer, NY, USA
Ordained PriestPtujska Gora, Slovenia
Ordained BishopSanta Maria, Church, Izmir, Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Izmir (Smirne).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2020
  • od/loc: CB, 8 Dec 2020
  • c1: CB, 22 Jan 2021
  • ob: AM, 23 Jan 2021
  • c2+: CB, 1 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 May 2021

Quantcast