Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Imad Khoshaba Gargees

Archbishop of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1978 Born
16 Nov 200325.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
8 Jun 200426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Jun 202042.2IncardinatedPriest of Dohuk (Duhok) (Chaldean), Iraq
26 Sep 202345.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran
10 Nov 202345.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Teheran (Chaldean), Iran

MicroData Summary for Imad Khoshaba Gargees
(WikiData: Q122829949)
Archbishop Imad Khoshaba Gargees (born ) Archbishop of Teheran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomane, Diocese of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
Ordained DeaconBaghdad, Patriarchate of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
Ordained PriestKomane, Diocese of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
Ordained BishopMar Ith Alaha, Cathedral, Dohuk, Diocese of Dohuk (Duhok) (Chaldean), Iraq

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Teheran (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2023
  • od: CB, 26 Sep 2023
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Nov 2023
  • c34: CB, 10 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 11 Nov 2023