Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Djibrail Kassab

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1938 BornTelkef
19 Jan 196122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Oct 199557.2AppointedArchbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq
5 May 199657.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq
21 Oct 200668.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney (Chaldean), Australia
15 Jan 201576.4RetiredBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney (Chaldean), Australia

MicroData Summary for Djibrail Kassab:
Archbishop Djibrail Kassab (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney

Please contact the Archbishop through the Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Sydney (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,746
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 15 Jan 2015