Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sarhad Yawsip Hermiz Jammo

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1941 BornBaghdad, Iraq
19 Dec 196423.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 200261.1AppointedBishop of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean), USA
18 Jul 200261.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean), USA
7 May 201675.1RetiredBishop of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean), USA

MicroData Summary for Sarhad Yawsip Hermiz Jammo
Bishop Sarhad Yawsip Hermiz Jammo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,229
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 May 2016