Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Farzo

Deceased

Bishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1831Born
1857²25.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 186938.1AppointedBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey
30 Jan 187038.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey
27 Jun 187342.3DiedBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Farzo
Bishop Gabriel Farzo (born , died ) Bishop of Mardin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMardin, Eparchy of Mardin (Chaldean)
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Campo Marzo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 16.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,342
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017