Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Timothee Attar (Hattar)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1832Born
1 Jan 186229.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 186937.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
30 Jan 187037.9Ordained BishopBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
26 Apr 187745.2ResignedBishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
21 Mar 187947.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey
26 Apr 188755.2ResignedBishop of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey
6 Oct 189159.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Mardin (Chaldean), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Timothee Attar (Hattar) (VIAF: 59191887)
Archbishop Pierre-Timothee Attar (Hattar) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mardin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiarbekir, Eparchy of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean)
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Campo Marzo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,341
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 244, and Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017