Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benoit Planchet, S.J. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1802Born
4 Jun 185351.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq
4 Jun 185351.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
15 Aug 185351.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
19 Sep 185957.6DiedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Benoit Planchet
Archbishop Benoit Planchet S.J. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGap, Diocese of Gap, France

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 559
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017