Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe-Jacques Abraham, O.A.O.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Chaldean), Turkey

Note/Previous Titular See: (Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1848Born
1873¹24.9Ordained PriestPriest
1875¹26.9AppointedBishop
25 Jul 187527.5Ordained BishopBishop
10 Feb 188234.1AppointedBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Chaldean), Turkey
26 Aug 191567.6DiedBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Chaldean), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe-Jacques Abraham
Bishop Philippe-Jacques Abraham O.A.O.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Gazireh (Gezira)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTelkef
Ordained BishopN.D. des Semences, Alquosh

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,346
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018