Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Augustin Bar-Chino (Barshino, Barscinu)

Deceased

Bishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean), Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1812Born
1841²28.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 184734.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean), Iran
11 Jul 184835.6Ordained BishopBishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean), Iran
1889²76.1DiedBishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean), Iran

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges Augustin Bar-Chino (Barshino, Barscinu)
Bishop Georges Augustin Bar-Chino (Barshino, Barscinu) (born , died 1889) Bishop of Salmas {Shahpour}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChorova, Diocese of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean)
Ordained BishopSimon Pierre Church, Mossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,331
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,848, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast